+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On September 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-187)
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-187.
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- South motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 577
- House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 450
- Executive Amendment Offered
- Forwarded to Governor
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Signature Requested
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Second House
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Hanes intended to vote "Nay"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 240
- Third Reading Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 65
- Third Reading Passed
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
March 1, 2018: Roll 577
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
February 22, 2018: Roll 450
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 9
February 8, 2018: Roll 240
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 11
January 23, 2018: Roll 65
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor