+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 44-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1909H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21103262D-H1
- Read second time
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 21103262D-H1
- Reported from Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned PS sub: Firearms
On January 9, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100496D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2021: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 44-N)
January 22, 2021: Reported from Public Safety with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
January 19, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor