+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB592 is now Act 996
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
- Rules suspended.
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
- Re-referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it do pass as amended 1
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on INSURANCE & COMMERCE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- EMERGENCY CLAUSE ADOPTED
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to INSURANCE & COMMERCE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendment
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Cloud
+ − Votes (4)
April 9, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
April 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Present/NV: 13
April 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 89
- Present/NV: 11
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor