+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB564 is now Act 820
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read the third time and passed.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 and #2 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1 and 2
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment S2
Sponsored by Irvin
Amendment S1
Sponsored by Irvin
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 93
- Present/NV: 7
April 1, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35