+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB278 is now Act 801
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Read the third time and passed.
- Rules suspended.
- House Amendment No. 1 read first time, rule suspended, read second time and concurred in.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass concur in House Amendment No. 1
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Returned From the House as passed as amended.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To Senate as passed, as amended # 1
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment No. 1 read and adopted and the bill ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for the purpose of amendment.
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- REPORTED CORRECTLY ENGROSSED
- Amendment # 1 read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and adopted, ordered engrossed.
- Placed on second reading for purpose of amendment.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee with the recommendation that it Do Pass as amended, Amendment # 1
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to PUBLIC HEALTH, WELFARE AND LABOR COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
Amendment H1
Sponsored by Hawks
Amendment S1
Sponsored by G. Stubblefield
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 12
March 18, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor