+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB237 is now Act 372
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on STATE AGENCIES & GOVT'L AFFAIRS- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to JUDICIARY COMMITTEE - SENATE
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
March 5, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 11
February 14, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35