+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Notification that SB153 is now Act 83
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR.
- Reported correctly enrolled and ordered delivered to the Governor.
- ORDERED ENROLLED
- Returned from the House as passed.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Returned To the Senate as passed.
- Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Returned by the Committee Do Pass
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read the first time, rules suspended, read the second time and referred to the Committee on EDUCATION COMMITTEE- HOUSE
- RECEIVED FROM THE SENATE
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered immediately transmitted to the House.
- Read the third time and passed.
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Returned by the Committee, with the recommendation that it Do Pass
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read first time, rules suspended, read second time, referred to EDUCATION COMMITTEE - SENATE
- Filed
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 6
February 7, 2019: Read the third time and passed and ordered transmitted to the Senate.
- Yeas: 91
- Present/NV: 9
January 31, 2019: Read the third time and passed.
- Yeas: 35
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor