+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 5, 2017 in the House:
- (67 affirmative votes required to override)
- House sustained Governor's veto (65-Y 34-N)
- Placed on Calendar
- VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (65-Y 34-N)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On March 13, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/13/17
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2000ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 34-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (65-Y 34-N)
- Pending question ordered
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read third time
- Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Chair votes No
- Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government with amendment (7-Y 6-N)
- Reconsidered by Local Government (13-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Failed to report (defeated) in Local Government (6-Y 6-N 1-A)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Local Government
- Rereferred from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (63-Y 33-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N)
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2000H1
- Pending question ordered
- Committee substitute agreed to 17105157D-H1
- Read second time
On February 4, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17105157D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N)
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 3-N)
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102598D
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (13)
April 5, 2017: VOTE: OVERRIDE GOVERNOR'S VETO (65-Y 34-N)
February 23, 2017: VOTE: ADOPTION (65-Y 34-N)
February 22, 2017: Passed Senate with amendment (21-Y 19-N)
February 22, 2017: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2017: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 21, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2017: Reported from Local Government with amendment (7-Y 6-N)
February 14, 2017: Failed to report (defeated) in Local Government (6-Y 6-N 1-A)
February 13, 2017: Rereferred from Courts of Justice (12-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2017: VOTE: PASSAGE (63-Y 33-N)
February 3, 2017: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 6-N)
February 3, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 3-N)
February 1, 2017: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor