+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Secretary of State Chapter 4 02/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Chapter number 4
- Secretary of State, Filed 02/21/17
On February 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 02/18/17
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Governor approval 2/17/2017
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Governor's action Approval 02/17/17
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Presented to Governor 2/16/2017
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Presentment date 02/16/17
- Third reading Passed
- Special Order
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Comm report: To pass
- Second reading
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received from House
- Referred to Finance
- Introduction and first reading
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Dettmer.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill was passed
- Third reading
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, February 6, 2017
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Jurgens.
- Second reading
- Committee report, to adopt
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Capital Investment
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Backer.
On January 9, 2017 in the House:
- Author added Johnson, C.
On January 5, 2017 in the House:
- Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance