+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017)
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans Affairs
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2017)
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2017)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs