+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/07/2017)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2017)
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017)
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor