+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/04/2019)
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2019)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/24/2019)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture