+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/30/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/28/2017)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (03/16/2017)
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration
- Meeting postponed (03/14/2017)
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2017)
- Introduced, referred to Senate Rules
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor