+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/16/2016)
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/15/2016)
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary