+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/06/2014)
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/30/2014)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education