+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/14/2015)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (04/08/2015)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2015)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs