+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2021)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2021)
- Proposed Substitute
On March 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2021)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor