+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/15/2017)
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2017)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce