+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 31, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/29/2018)
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2018)
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2018)
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (03/13/2018)
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary