+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/04/2014)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2014)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs