+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- House passed as amended in concurrence
On June 12, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2014)
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence
On June 6, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2014)
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended (floor amendment)
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/03/2014)
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014)
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government