+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On April 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On April 8, 2014 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (04/08/2014)
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (03/25/2014)
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/25/2014)
On February 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/12/2014)
On January 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs