+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013)
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (03/06/2013)
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2013)
On January 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor