+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On October 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On October 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
On June 22, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2017)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2017)
On June 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Finance