+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed as amended in concurrence
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- House passed as amended (floor amendment)
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2019)
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/25/2019)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2019)
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2019)
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2019)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor