+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On September 19, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On September 15, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/30/2017)
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2017)
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government