+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
- Signed by Governor
On June 22, 2021 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2021)
On June 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021)
On June 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House State Government & Elections
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2021)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/03/2021)
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2021)