+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/23/2015)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 21, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2015)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Municipal Government
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/03/2015)
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/27/2015)
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2015)
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government