+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013)
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/11/2013)
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/04/2013)
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2013)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services