+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub B in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/30/2017)
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- House passed Sub B
- Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
- Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2017)
- Referred to House Corporations
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs