+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (01/31/2019)
On January 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (01/29/2019)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/23/2019)
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Recommended for Immediate Consideration
- Senate read and passed