+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2015)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 14, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2015)
On June 11, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/11/2015)
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/12/2015)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor