+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 15, 2021 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 11, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/15/2021)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2021)
On May 19, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Education
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2021)
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/12/2021)
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2021)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education