+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
- Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017)
- Referred to House Corporations
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017)
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017)
On May 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2017)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor