+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2017)
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
On June 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/01/2017)
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2017)
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2017)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education