+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On June 24, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to House Finance
On June 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/22/2021)
On June 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/16/2021)
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/19/2021)
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor