+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (03/06/2019)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Meeting postponed (02/12/2019)
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2019)
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On January 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/05/2019)
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (01/22/2019)
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor