+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On July 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2013)
On June 27, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
- Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2013)
On June 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/26/2013)
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2013)
On June 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate voted to recommit to Senate Labor
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate held on desk
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/29/2013)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/22/2013)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor