+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On July 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 26, 2013 in the House:
- House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013)
On June 24, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013)
- Committee transferred to House Environment and Natural Resources
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/04/2013)
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2013)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2013)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture