+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/21/2017)
On June 13, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2017)
On June 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/07/2017)
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017)
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2017)
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary