+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On May 19, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (05/21/2015)
On May 13, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 8, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2015)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Veterans Affairs
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/14/2015)
- Committee recommends passage
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2015)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs