+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On June 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2015)
On June 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2015)
On May 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/26/2015)
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary