+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013)
On June 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 22, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2013)
On June 18, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 14, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2013)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/02/2013)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/26/2013)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government