+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
- Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2015)
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/24/2015)
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Environment and Natural Resources
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On May 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/20/2015)
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/13/2015)
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/08/2015)
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor