+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 9, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017)
On May 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 19, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/23/2017)
On May 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/04/2017)
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017)
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government