+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 6, 2013 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On May 30, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/06/2013)
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On May 24, 2013 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2013)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (04/04/2013)
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2013)
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Education
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor