+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Effective without Governor's signature
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On May 1, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (05/05/2015)
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/29/2015)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to House Judiciary
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (04/14/2015)
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2015)
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor