+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub B
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
- Senate passed Sub B in concurrence
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/26/2019)
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub B
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
- Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019)
On June 14, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House H.E.W.
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2019)
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/06/2019)
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2019)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary