+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the House:
- House passed Sub A in concurrence
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
On June 18, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2019)
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/18/2019)
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On June 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2019)
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Corporations
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate passed Sub A
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (05/14/2019)
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage of Sub A
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/02/2019)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Proposed Substitute
- Meeting postponed (04/25/2019)
On April 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2019)
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government