+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On July 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Governor
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmitted to Governor
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- House passed in concurrence
On June 24, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/27/2017)
On June 21, 2017 in the House:
- Committee recommends passage in concurrence
On June 16, 2017 in the House:
- Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2017)
On June 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Labor
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate read and passed
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Senate Calendar (06/13/2017)
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommends passage
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2017)
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended measure be held for further study
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2017)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced, referred to Senate Labor